MO HB624 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Show Me Success Diploma Program as an alternative graduation pathway for high school students
Title
Establishes the Show Me Success Diploma Program as an alternative graduation pathway for high school students
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 624 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 29, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 6th, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 157 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 As Amended adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |