MO HB62 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding marriage and replaces marriage licenses with contracts of domestic union
Title
Changes the laws regarding marriage and replaces marriage licenses with contracts of domestic union
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB62&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0126H.01I.pdf |