MO HB617 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers to report prices for most common procedures
Title
Requires hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers to report prices for most common procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |