MO HB612 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the Missouri State Council on the Arts to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor by type II transfer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers the Missouri State Council on the Arts to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor by type II transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 612 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-06-24SenateApproved by the Lieutenant-Governor (G)
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-04-23SenateSenate Message (S)
2019-04-23SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-04-23SenateTaken Up
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-01SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 1, 2019, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Professional Registration(S)
2019-03-14HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-03-14HouseTaken Up
2019-03-12HousePerfected (H)
2019-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-12HouseTaken Up
2019-02-26HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-21HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-01-22HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback