MO HB604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the regulation of insurance
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the regulation of insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: HB 604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House: HB 604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-07-07 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-19 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SSA 1 for SA 4 AYES: 29 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 10, 1:15 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, and SSA 1 for SA 4 adopted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 1 p.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 Adopted |
2021-04-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Insurance(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-30 | House | Prefiled (H) |