MO HB599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions by simplifying filing requirements.
Title
Changes the laws regarding financial institutions by simplifying filing requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House: HB 599 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 2, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 9:10am, SCR 1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019,1:01pm, SCR 1 Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 9:02am, SCR 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-26 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |