MO HB590 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding taxation
Title
Changes the laws regarding taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-13 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-13 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB590&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0590I.PDF |