MO HB589 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating public health
Title
Modifies provisions relating public health
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: HB 589 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 589 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 1:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 to HA 2, HA 3 to HA 2, and HA 2 as amended, adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |