MO HB587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the "Missouri Treated Timber Law."
Title
Repeals the "Missouri Treated Timber Law."
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: HB 587 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 1:15pm, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 2 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-05 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-05 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 25 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |