MO HB586 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits a peer support specialist from disclosing any confidential communication properly entrusted to the counselor by law enforcement and emergency personnel while receiving counseling

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits a peer support specialist from disclosing any confidential communication properly entrusted to the counselor by law enforcement and emergency personnel while receiving counseling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - House: HB 586 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-20SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 13, 2017, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
2017-03-28SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2017-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
2017-03-13HouseTaken Up
2017-03-07HousePerfected (H)
2017-03-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-03-07HouseHCS Defeated (H)
2017-03-07HouseTaken Up
2017-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-25HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2017-01-12HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback