MO HB581 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes provisions relating to charter schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes provisions relating to charter schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseDropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
2019-04-23HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-04-17HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-25HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2019-03-06HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-02-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-12HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-23HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2019-01-17HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback