MO HB575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers.
Title
Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 575 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 575 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 575 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 52 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |