MO HB575 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 575 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 575 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 4) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 (*HA 6) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 575 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-18SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 52 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-03HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-04-02HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 adopted
2019-04-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-02HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-05HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
2019-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-13HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2019-01-16HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB575&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0952H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0952H.01P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.016.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/045.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/048.019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/048.018.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback