MO HB573 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to rights of accused college students in Title IX proceedings.
Title
Creates new provisions relating to rights of accused college students in Title IX proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |