MO HB57 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Enhances the penalty for certain crimes when the victim is a special victim

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances the penalty for certain crimes when the victim is a special victim

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - House: HB 57 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: HB 57 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-21SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 3:00 p.m., Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-21SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Hearing rescheduled
2017-04-20SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, April 21, 2017,8:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-18SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2017-04-13SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-12SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2017-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-06SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 10, 2017, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2017-02-23SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2017-02-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-16HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-16HouseTaken Up
2017-02-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-14HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-02-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-02-14HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-02-14HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-14HouseTaken Up
2017-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback