MO HB568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes political subdivisions to elect to cover certain positions as public safety personal for purposes of retirement plans.
Title
Authorizes political subdivisions to elect to cover certain positions as public safety personal for purposes of retirement plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 568 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 2 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |