MO HB563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
Pending: House Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
Pending: House Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the "Missouri State Employees' Retirement System."
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the "Missouri State Employees' Retirement System."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 563 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 563 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 1:15pm, Pershing Conference Room |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 18 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |