MO HB559 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to working animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to working animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 559 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 559 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-06SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8, 2019, 9:45AM, BINGHAM CONFERENCE ROOM
2019-05-06SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-05-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 6, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 2
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-03HousePerfected (H)
2019-04-03HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-04-03HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-03HouseTaken Up
2019-04-03HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2019-04-02HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-03-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-06HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-03-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseAction Postponed (H)
2019-02-20HouseExecutive Session Continued
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2019-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback