MO HB555 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Safe Schools Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Safe Schools Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-04-19HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-14HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-11HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback