MO HB552 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Litigation Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-25HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2017-01-11HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback