MO HB550 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Consumer Legal Funding Model Act."
Title
Establishes the "Consumer Legal Funding Model Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB550&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1208H.01I.pdf |