MO HB549 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-24 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for a violent offender registry, which will include any person on probation or parole for first or second degree murder
Title
Establishes procedures for a violent offender registry, which will include any person on probation or parole for first or second degree murder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2023-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |