MO HB549 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Corrections, the Division of Probation and Parole, and the Parole Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-10HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-17HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB549&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1021H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1021H.02C.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1021H02.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1021H02.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1021H02.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1021H02.05H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0549I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1021H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1021H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0549C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback