MO HB547 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to alcoholic beverages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 547 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 13, 2021, 12:00 p.m. or upon recess, whichever is later, SCR 1
2021-03-11SenateSecond read and referred: General Laws(S)
2021-02-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-02-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-22HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-02-17HousePerfected (H)
2021-02-17HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-02-17HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-02-17HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-02-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-03HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-17HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB547&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1406H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1406H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1406H.04P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0547I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1406H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1406H.04C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0547C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1406H.04P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0547P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/027.005.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback