MO HB545 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding the sale of public bonds to require certain political subdivisions to issue debt at public sale
Title
Changes the law regarding the sale of public bonds to require certain political subdivisions to issue debt at public sale
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Vescovo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB545&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0378H.02I.pdf |