MO HB541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that cases a prosecuting attorney determines not to commence may be forwarded to the attorney general's office for review.
Title
Provides that cases a prosecuting attorney determines not to commence may be forwarded to the attorney general's office for review.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2019-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB541&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1345H.01I.pdf |