MO HB540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires abortion risk factor evaluation and the reporting of risk factors.
Title
Requires abortion risk factor evaluation and the reporting of risk factors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2019-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB540&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1335H.01I.pdf |