MO HB527 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions for eminent domain for utility purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions for eminent domain for utility purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: HB 527 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: HB 527 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-02-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 1
2021-02-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-02-23HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED
2021-02-23HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-02-23HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-02-23HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-02-22HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-04HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-03HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB527&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1096H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1096H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1096H.02P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1096H02.01H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0527I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1096H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0527C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1096H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1096H.02P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0527P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/030.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/030.003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback