MO HB523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the no-call list.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the no-call list.
Sponsors
Rep. Shane Roden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 523 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2019, 12:00pm, SCR 2 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |