MO HB520 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for educational or fitness class fees paid to any health club, athletic club, exercise club, fitness club, or other similar club or facility
Title
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for educational or fitness class fees paid to any health club, athletic club, exercise club, fitness club, or other similar club or facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB520&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0520I.htm |