MO HB52 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows concealed carrying of firearms on public transportation systems and transporting nonfunctional or unloaded firearms on public buses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows concealed carrying of firearms on public transportation systems and transporting nonfunctional or unloaded firearms on public buses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - House: HB 52 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: HB 52 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-08SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-03-30SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 30, Noon or uupon morning recess
2021-03-25SenateSecond read and referred: General Laws(S)
2021-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-03-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 3
2021-03-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-03-03HousePerfected (H)
2021-03-03HouseTaken Up
2021-03-02HouseLaid Over (H)
2021-03-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-02HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-01HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-02-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-09HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-29HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback