MO HB52 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the due date for certain trailer license plate renewals from December to May.
Title
Changes the due date for certain trailer license plate renewals from December to May.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB52&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0060H.01I.pdf |