MO HB510 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes alternative instruction delivery systems for virtual instructional programs in public schools and charter schools
Title
Establishes alternative instruction delivery systems for virtual instructional programs in public schools and charter schools
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |