MO HB507 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Advisory Council on Safe and Strong Schools."
Title
Creates the "Advisory Council on Safe and Strong Schools."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB507&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1194H.01I.pdf |