MO HB502 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to fantasy sports contests

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to fantasy sports contests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 502 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 502 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 52 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-20SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-20SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 20, 2017, 10:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-11SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Progress and Development(S)
2017-04-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 52 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-03HouseTaken Up
2017-04-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-30HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-03-29HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-03-29HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-03-29HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-03-29HouseTaken Up
2017-03-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-08HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-07HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-01HouseReturned to Committee of Origin (H) - General Laws AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-01HouseVoted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H)
2017-03-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback