MO HB501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Missouri "Show Me" tartan, as registered with the Scottish Tartans Authority in Pitlochry, Scotland, as the official tartan of the state of Missouri.
Title
Designates the Missouri "Show Me" tartan, as registered with the Scottish Tartans Authority in Pitlochry, Scotland, as the official tartan of the state of Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 501 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess whichever is later, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 6 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |