MO HB500 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Statewide Mechanical Contractor Licensing Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 500 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: HB 500 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: HB 500 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 26, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |