MO HB50 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the requirements for disclosure of information regarding insurance holding companies
Title
Changes the requirements for disclosure of information regarding insurance holding companies
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - HB 50 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - HB 50 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - HB 50 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-03 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-30 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 136 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 23, 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 31, 2015, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-02-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Insurance(H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |