MO HB498 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the "A+ Schools Program."
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the "A+ Schools Program."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB498&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1200H.01I.pdf |