MO HB497 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Public Schools
Title
Relating to Public Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Lewis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House: HB 497 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 9, 2023, 8:15 a.m. Senate Lounge |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education and Workforce Development(S) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 10 |
2023-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 and HA 6, adopted. |
2023-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |