MO HB496 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows licensed veterinarians to administer or prescribe legend drugs for use in animals and changes the membership of an advisory committee of the Board of Pharmacy regarding drug distributors
Title
Allows licensed veterinarians to administer or prescribe legend drugs for use in animals and changes the membership of an advisory committee of the Board of Pharmacy regarding drug distributors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB496&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0496I.htm |