MO HB494 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Local Government Employees' Retirement System
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - HB 494 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1, AMENDED 2. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions(S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2015-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |