MO HB481 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-09 - Withdrawn (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits settlements that conflict with certain RSMo sections and allows the general assembly to intervene in certain civil actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits settlements that conflict with certain RSMo sections and allows the general assembly to intervene in certain civil actions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-09HouseWithdrawn (H)
2023-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2022-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback