MO HB48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to include certain additional information in its annual combined financial report
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to include certain additional information in its annual combined financial report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |