MO HB478 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-19HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-23HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-01-08HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback