MO HB476 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Title
Modifies provisions relating to professional registration
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 476 (SA 5, SA 6, & SA 8) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 476 (SA 5, SA 6, & SA 8) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: HB 476 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 476 (SA 5, SA 6, & SA 8) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: HB 476 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-22 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2,SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 9:00 a.m., Joint Committee Room |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8, Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 2:00 p.m., Monday, March 22, 2021, Senate Lounge |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |