MO HB475 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts counties of the third and fourth classification from prevailing wage laws for the construction of public works projects that are less than $500,000
Title
Exempts counties of the third and fourth classification from prevailing wage laws for the construction of public works projects that are less than $500,000
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB475&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0887H.01I.pdf |