MO HB473 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-04HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-14HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback