MO HB464 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts contracts for health care benefits provided by farm bureaus from state insurance regulation
Title
Exempts contracts for health care benefits provided by farm bureaus from state insurance regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2023-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Healthcare Reform(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |