MO HB464 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each local school district and charter school to have on file a policy for reading success plans for certain students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-04-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-04-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-03-05HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2019-02-13HouseReferred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-01-08HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback